VA SB894 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Statewide Building Code; who may be cited for violations. Clarifies that a local enforcement officer may issue a summons or a ticket to the lessor or sublessor of a residential dwelling unit for violation of any Building Code provision, provided a copy of the notice is also served on the owner of the property.
Title
Uniform Statewide Building Code; who may be cited for violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N) (Y: 88 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529) | |
2013-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 529 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB894ER) |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed House (87-Y 12-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-14 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | House | Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 13100545D-E |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB894E |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100545D |