VA SB894 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0428)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0428)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth Transportation Board's cooperation with persons maintaining marine museums. Repeals a Code of Virginia provision authorizing the CTB to cooperate with persons maintaining marine museums in a county in the Commonwealth adjoining a city located on navigable water with a population of 30,000 or more.
Title
Transportation Board; cooperation with persons maintaining marine museums.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0428) | |
2011-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 428 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB894ER) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-14 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-10 | House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-13 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103140D |
Subjects
Arts and Humanities
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Transportation
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Transportation