VA SB892 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Safe reporting of overdoses. Establishes an affirmative defense to prosecution of an individual for (i) simple possession of a controlled substance, marijuana, or controlled paraphernalia; (ii) intoxication in public; or (iii) the unlawful purchase, possession, or consumption of alcohol if such individual sought or obtained emergency medical attention for himself or for another individual because of a drug-related or alcohol-related overdose and if the evidence for the charge was obtained as a result of the individual seeking or obtaining emergency medical attention. The bill provides that the affirmative defense may only be invoked by an individual who (a) remains at the scene of the overdose or at any location to which he is transported for emergency medical attention until a law-enforcement officer responds to the report of an overdose or, if no law-enforcement officer is present at either the scene or the other location, cooperates with law enforcement, (b) identifies himself to the responding law-enforcement officer, and (c) cooperates, upon request, with any criminal investigation reasonably related to the drug or alcohol that resulted in the overdose. No individual may assert this affirmative defense if the emergency medical attention sought or obtained was during the execution of a search warrant or during the conduct of a lawful search or a lawful arrest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Overdoses; establishes an affirmative defense to prosecution of an individual, etc., safe reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House of Delegates - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 34-N) (Y: 3 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-13 - House of Delegates - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 4-N) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House of Delegates - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418)
2015-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 418 (effective 7/1/15)
2015-03-10 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
2015-03-10SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
2015-03-07SenateSigned by President
2015-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-03-06SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB892ER)
2015-03-06SenateEnrolled
2015-02-27SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2015-02-27SenateReconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2015-02-27SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 1-N)
2015-02-26HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2015-02-26HouseConference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
2015-02-26SenateConference substitute printed 15105528D-S1
2015-02-26 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2015-02-23HouseDelegates: Gilbert, Bell, Robert B., Carr
2015-02-23HouseConferees appointed by House
2015-02-20SenateSenators: Petersen, Stuart, Garrett
2015-02-20SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2015-02-20SenateSenate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-18HouseHouse requested conference committee
2015-02-18HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2015-02-17SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 34-N)
2015-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 4-N)
2015-02-13HousePassed House with substitute (90-Y 4-N)
2015-02-13HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB892H1
2015-02-13HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 15105004D-H1
2015-02-13HouseRead third time
2015-02-12HouseRead second time
2015-02-11HouseCommittee substitute printed 15105004D-H1
2015-02-11HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
2015-02-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2015-02-06HouseRead first time
2015-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2015-01-28SenatePrinted as engrossed 15102035D-E
2015-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB892E
2015-01-28SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2015-01-28SenateReading of amendments waived
2015-01-28SenateRead second time
2015-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2015-01-26SenateReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2015-01-07SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2015-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102035D

Same As/Similar To

HB1500 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182251.03(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+SB892
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB892+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB892E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB892H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB892S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB892ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+CHAP0418+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S03V0082+SB0892
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0136SB0892+SB0892
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0155SB0892+SB0892
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H08V0303+SB0892
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2322+SB0892
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0505SB0892+SB0892
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0661SB0892+SB0892
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2877+SB0892
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0994SB0892+SB0892
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0996SB0892+SB0892
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0997SB0892+SB0892

Bill Comments

feedback