VA SB872 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expansion of gang-free zones. Adds school bus stops and publicly owned parks, libraries and hospitals to the list of places denoted "gang-free zones." Criminal gang activity that occurs in gang-free zones receives additional punishment.
Title
Gang-free zones; expanded to include any school bus stop or public buildings, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | Senate: Left in Finance | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103203D |