VA SB87 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0255)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0255)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Falls Church. Shifts elections for city council from May to November. Council members shall have their four-year terms shortened by six months during the transition. The bill also provides that candidates shall be nominated only by petition in the manner prescribed by law for nonparty candidates and not by caucus, primary, convention, or other party-affiliated proceeding.
Title
Charter; City of Falls Church.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0255) | |
2012-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 255 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-28 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB87ER) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Title replaced 12105487D-S1 | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: Passed House with substitute (99-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB87H1 | |
2012-02-21 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105487D-H1 | |
2012-02-21 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-20 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-17 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105487D-H1 | |
2012-02-17 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | Senate: Assigned Local Gov sub: Charter | |
2012-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101197D |
Same As/Similar To
HB978 (Same As) 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0452)