VA SB868 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0284)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0284)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Water or sewer systems; delinquent payment of rates and charges. Repeals a provision of the Virginia Water and Waste Authorities Act that limits a landlord's liability for a tenant's separately metered sewer or water charges to three delinquent billing periods of no more than 90 days in total. The provision being repealed also prohibits a water or sewer authority from refusing service to the affected premises, or other premises of the landlord, on account of the delinquency as long as the landlord has paid the charges for which he is liable.
Title
Water or sewer systems; delinquent payment of rates and charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0284) | |
2015-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 284 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/24/15 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB868ER) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102480D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1424 (Same As) 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)