VA HB1424 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Water or sewer systems; delinquent payment of rates and charges. Repeals a provision of the Virginia Water and Waste Authorities Act that limits a landlord's liability for a tenant's separately metered sewer or water charges to three delinquent billing periods of no more than 90 days in total. The provision being repealed also prohibits a water or sewer authority from refusing service to the affected premises, or other premises of the landlord, on account of the delinquency as long as the landlord has paid the charges for which he is liable.
Title
Virginia Water and Waste Authorities Act; delinquent payment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263) | |
2015-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 263 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1424ER) |
2015-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2014-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2014-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101131D |
Same As/Similar To
SB969 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0131)