VA SB864 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Possession or transportation of firearms; protective orders; penalty. Creates a Class 1 misdemeanor for the physical possession of a firearm while in the residence of the alleged victim or the transport of a firearm by a person who has been served with an emergency protective order issued as a result of an assault and battery against a family or household member. The bill also provides that in order to be convicted of the existing Class 1 misdemeanor of purchasing or transporting a firearm when subject to a protective order the person must have been served with the order.
Title
Firearms; possession within residence of victim by persons subject to protective orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-18 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2013-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-02-12 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal |
2013-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-02-08 | House | Referred from Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote |
2013-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #2 |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2013-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 13102324D-E |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB864E |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Favola agreed to |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102324D |