VA SB853 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; Culturally Relevant and Inclusive Education Practices Advisory Committee; report. Requires the Department of Education to establish and appoint such members as it deems appropriate to a Culturally Relevant and Inclusive Education Practices Advisory Committee for the purpose of providing (i) standards recommendations to the Department of Education that shall be considered by the Board of Education during the 2021-2022 review of the history and social science Standards of Learning and (ii) recommendations on meaningful professional development with school personnel related to culturally relevant and inclusive education practices. The bill requires the Committee to report its recommendations to the Board of Education, the Governor, and the Chairs of the House Committee on Education and the Senate Committee on Education and Health no later than July 1, 2021.
Title
Culturally Relevant and Inclusive Education Practices Advisory Committee; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 41-N) (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 41-N) (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0573) | |
2020-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 573 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB853ER) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | VOTE: Passage (56-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed House with amendments (56-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-17 | House | Reported from Education with amendments (15-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB853S1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20105926D-S1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20105926D-S1 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105085D |
Same As/Similar To
HB916 (Same As) 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0572)