VA SB812 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Telephone Privacy Protection Act. Provides that for the purposes of the Virginia Telephone Privacy Act (the Act), "telephone solicitation call" includes any text message sent to any wireless telephone with a Virginia area code, or to a wireless telephone registered to any natural person who is a resident of the Commonwealth, for the purpose of offering or advertising any property, goods, or services for sale, lease, license, or investment, including offering or advertising an extension of credit or for the purpose of fraudulent activity. The bill prohibits a telephone solicitor from engaging in any conduct that results in the display of false or misleading caller identification information on the called party's telephone. The bill increases the amount of damages and the amount of the civil penalty for violations of the Act from $500 for each such violation to $500 for a first violation, $1,000 for a second violation, and $5,000 for each subsequent violation and increases to $5,000 the maximum civil penalty the court may impose for a willful first or second violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Telephone Privacy Protection Act; telephone solicitation calls.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-02 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607)
2020-04-02 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 607 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05SenateSigned by President
2020-03-04SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB812ER)
2020-03-04SenateEnrolled
2020-02-27HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-27HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-27HouseRead third time
2020-02-26HouseRead second time
2020-02-24HouseReported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
2020-02-18HouseReferred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB812S2
2020-02-11SenateSubstitute by Senator Lucas agreed to 20108172D-S2
2020-02-11SenateFloor substitute printed 20108172D-S2 (Lucas)
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateCommittee amendment rejected
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute rejected 20108055D-S1
2020-02-11SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2020-02-09SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-09SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108055D-S1
2020-02-09SenateIncorporates SB201 (Lucas)
2020-02-09SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103838D

Same As/Similar To

HB1244 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591512(n/a)See Bill Text
591513(n/a)See Bill Text
591513.2(n/a)See Bill Text
591514(n/a)See Bill Text
591518.1(n/a)See Bill Text
591518.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB812&201+sum+SB812
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB812+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB812S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB812S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB812ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0607+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0130+SB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0290+SB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0591SB0812+SB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0594SB0812+SB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0595SB0812+SB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H21V0063+SB0812
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1585+SB0812

Bill Comments

feedback