VA SB805 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB805
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Robbery; penalty. Defines "robbery" and creates degrees of punishment corresponding to the severity of a robbery offense. Any person who commits a robbery by causing serious bodily injury is guilty of robbery in the first degree, which is punishable by confinement in a state correctional facility for a maximum term of life. Any person who commits robbery by displaying a firearm in a threatening manner is guilty of robbery in the second degree, which is punishable by confinement in a state correctional facility for a maximum term of 20 years. Any person who commits robbery by using physical force not resulting in serious bodily injury, or by displaying a deadly weapon other than a firearm in a threatening manner, is guilty of robbery in the third degree, which is punishable as a Class 5 felony. Any person who commits robbery by any other means is guilty of robbery in the fourth degree, which is punishable as a Class 6 felony. Under current law, any robbery is punishable by confinement in a state correctional facility for life or any term not less than five years.
Title
Robbery; definition, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Chair votes Yes |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB805S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107417D-S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107417D-S1 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103176D |
Same As/Similar To
SB805 (Carry Over) 2020-02-28 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote