VA SB805 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB805

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Robbery; penalty. Defines "robbery" and creates degrees of punishment corresponding to the severity of a robbery offense. Any person who commits a robbery by causing serious bodily injury is guilty of robbery in the first degree, which is punishable by confinement in a state correctional facility for a maximum term of life. Any person who commits robbery by displaying a firearm in a threatening manner is guilty of robbery in the second degree, which is punishable by confinement in a state correctional facility for a maximum term of 20 years. Any person who commits robbery by using physical force not resulting in serious bodily injury, or by displaying a deadly weapon other than a firearm in a threatening manner, is guilty of robbery in the third degree, which is punishable as a Class 5 felony. Any person who commits robbery by any other means is guilty of robbery in the fourth degree, which is punishable as a Class 6 felony. Under current law, any robbery is punishable by confinement in a state correctional facility for life or any term not less than five years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Robbery; definition, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28HouseContinued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2020-02-18HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-02-12HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-12HouseRead first time
2020-02-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-06SenateChair votes Yes
2020-02-06SenateRead third time and passed Senate (20-Y 20-N)
2020-02-06SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB805S1
2020-02-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107417D-S1
2020-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-05SenateRead second time
2020-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 5-N)
2020-02-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107417D-S1
2020-01-24SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103176D

Same As/Similar To

SB805 (Carry Over) 2020-02-28 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18258(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback