VA SB804 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1147)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1147)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Minimum Wage Act; domestic service. Eliminates the exclusion in the Virginia Minimum Wage Act for persons employed in domestic service. The bill requires the Secretary of Commerce and Trade to convene a work group consisting of representatives from the Department of Labor and Industry, the Virginia Employment Commission, the Workers' Compensation Commission, organizations representing domestic workers, and such other stakeholders as the Secretary of Commerce and Trade deems appropriate to make recommendations, including any necessary statutory and regulatory changes, with regard to protecting domestic service employees from workplace harassment and discrimination, providing remedies for such employees for the nonpayment of wages, ensuring the safety and health of such employees in the workplace, and protecting such employees from loss of income as a result of unemployment or employment-related injury by including coverage of such employees in the Virginia Unemployment Compensation Act and the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act.
Title
Employees providing domestic service; definitions, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1147) | |
2020-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1147 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB804ER) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (34-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House with amendments (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (13-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB804S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108041D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108041D-S1 |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105005D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 3903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 28.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 49.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 49.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 219 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |