VA SB794 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0635)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0635)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Testimony of certain judicial personnel. Clarifies that certain persons who have the power to issue warrants are competent to testify in a criminal proceeding in which the defendant is charged with perjury.
Title
Judicial personnel; testimony of certain personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 20-N) (Y: 81 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 20-N) (Y: 81 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0635) | |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 635 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB794ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Title replaced 15105188D-H1 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 20-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Passed House with substitute (79-Y 20-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB794H1 |
2015-02-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105188D-H1 |
2015-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105188D-H1 |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB794S1 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15103782D-S1 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15103782D-S1 |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 1-N) |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100270D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 271 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 71 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 72 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |