VA SB784 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Transmission lines; relocation and undergrounding. Requires that any transmission line of 230 kilovolts or less that is proposed to connect to a proposed new substation that has received local final development plan approval be placed underground if (i) such line would extend from an existing substation that will be powered by a transmission line of 230 kilovolts or less, (ii) such line received a certificate of public convenience and necessity from the Commission to be placed underground prior to December 31, 2018; (iii) the portion of such line between the existing substation and the proposed new substation is not more than 4,500 linear feet; and (iv) the total cost of undergrounding the proposed relocated transmission line does not exceed $40 million. The bill requires that existing overhead transmission lines that meet such criteria be replaced and relocated with a new underground transmission line and that the location of the new underground transmission line be consistent with the comprehensive plan and the economic development priorities of the governing body of the locality in which the new underground transmission line is to be placed. The bill has an expiration date of December 31, 2021.
Title
Transmission lines; relocation and undergrounding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Energy |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102022D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB784 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB784+hil |