VA SB78 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1146)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1146)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Minimum wage; pay based on work done. Eliminates the exemption to Virginia's minimum wage requirements for persons who normally work and are paid based on the amount of work done.
Title
Minimum wage; pay based on work done.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1146) | |
2020-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1146 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB78ER) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed House (55-Y 45-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101357D |