VA SB776 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0388)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0388)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; residency of children in kinship care. Allows a child receiving kinship care from an adult relative to enroll in the school division where the kinship care provider resides. The bill also allows local school divisions to require one legal parent and the kinship care provider to sign affidavits detailing the kinship care arrangement as well as a power of attorney authorizing the adult relative to make educational decisions regarding the child.
Title
Public schools; residency of children in kinship care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0388) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0388) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 388 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-08 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB776ER) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-02 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-29 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-02-17 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16104536D |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Unanimous consent to introduce |