VA SB766 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Citizen water quality monitoring; use as evidence in enforcement actions. Authorizes the Department of Environmental Quality (the Department) to use certain results of citizen water quality testing as evidence in enforcement actions. Such evidence is currently prohibited. The bill also directs the Department to consider in some cases data collected by a citizen group, regardless of whether the data conforms to the requirements set out in the Code of Virginia.
Title
Citizen water quality monitoring; use as evidence in enforcement actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-30 | Senate | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104064D |