VA SB763 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Local tax exemption; solar energy equipment. Changes the local property tax exemption for solar energy projects from an 80 percent exemption for the life of the project to a step down scale of an 80 percent exemption in the first five years, 70 percent in the second five years, and 60 percent for all remaining years in service. The change applies to solar energy projects that are either (i) projects greater than 20 megawatts and less than 150 megawatts for which an initial interconnection request form has been filed with an electric utility or a regional transmission organization after January 1, 2015, and first in service on or after January 1, 2017, and (ii) projects equaling more than five megawatts and less than 150 megawatts for which an initial interconnection request form has been filed on or after January 1, 2019. The bill provides that if a locality assesses a revenue share on a project, the phase-down shall not apply. The bill extends the sunset date after which new projects may not qualify for the exemption from January 1, 2024 to July 1, 2030.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local tax; amount of exemption for solar energy equipment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 39-N) (Y: 51 N: 38 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N) (Y: 4 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 38-N) (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18SenateEnrolled
2020-03-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB763ER)
2020-03-08HouseVOTE: Adoption (51-Y 39-N)
2020-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (51-Y 39-N)
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-03-07SenateConference substitute printed 20109839D-S2
2020-03-07 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-05HouseDelegates: Jones, Hudson, Kilgore
2020-03-05HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-04SenateSenators: Barker, Ebbin, Chafin
2020-03-04SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-04SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-03HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-03-03HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2020-03-02SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N)
2020-02-27HouseVOTE: Passage (58-Y 38-N)
2020-02-27HousePassed House with substitute (58-Y 38-N)
2020-02-27HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB763H1
2020-02-27HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108890D-H1
2020-02-27HouseRead third time
2020-02-26HouseRead second time
2020-02-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108890D-H1
2020-02-24HouseReported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB763S1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107355D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107355D-S1
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103372D

Same As/Similar To

HB1434 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813660(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB763&201+sum+SB763
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB763+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB763S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB763H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB763S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB763ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0251+SB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0763+SB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0520SB0763+SB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0521SB0763+SB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0522SB0763+SB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0523SB0763+SB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H10V0350+SB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1568+SB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1350SB0763+SB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1512SB0763+SB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1833SB0763+SB0763
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2075+SB0763

Bill Comments

feedback