VA HB1434 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1028)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1028)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local tax exemption; solar energy equipment. Changes the local property tax exemption for solar energy projects from an 80 percent exemption for the life of the project to a step down scale of an 80 percent exemption in the first five years, 70 percent in the second five years, and 60 percent for all remaining years in service. The change applies to solar energy projects that are either (i) projects greater than 20 megawatts and less than 150 megawatts for which an initial interconnection request form has been filed with an electric utility or a regional transmission organization after January 1, 2015, and first in service on or after January 1, 2017, and (ii) projects equaling more than five megawatts and less than 150 megawatts for which an initial interconnection request form has been filed on or after January 1, 2019. The bill provides that if a locality assesses a revenue share on a project, the step down scale shall not apply. The bill extends the sunset date after which new projects may not qualify for the exemption from January 1, 2024, to July 1, 2030.
Title
Local tax; amount of exemption for solar energy equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 44-N 1-A) (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 44-N 1-A) (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1028) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1028 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1434ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 44-N 1-A) |
2020-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (52-Y 44-N 1-A) |
2020-03-07 | House | Conference substitute printed 20109780D-H2 |
2020-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Barker, Ebbin, Chafin |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Delegates: Jones, Hudson, Kilgore |
2020-03-04 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-04 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20108943D-S1 (0-Y 99-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1434S1 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108943D-S1 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108943D-S1 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1434H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107370D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107370D-H1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103174D |
Same As/Similar To
SB763 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1029)