VA SB758 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1269)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Electric personal delivery devices. Makes several changes related to electric personal delivery devices, including changing the term used to refer to such devices to "personal delivery devices" and changing the weight limit of such devices from 50 to 500 pounds. The bill allows localities to regulate the use of personal delivery devices on sidewalks, crosswalks, or roadways but requires a locality to allow a personal delivery device to operate on the side of a roadway with a speed limit of 25 miles per hour or less if a sidewalk is not available.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric personal delivery devices; changes related to devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (81-Y 1-N) (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 12-N) (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1269)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1269 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled bill text (SB758ER2)
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (81-Y 1-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (81-Y 1-N)
2020-04-22HousePassed by temporarily
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N)
2020-04-11SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05SenateSigned by President
2020-03-04SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB758ER)
2020-03-04SenateEnrolled
2020-02-27SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25HouseVOTE: Passage (88-Y 12-N)
2020-02-25HousePassed House with amendments (88-Y 12-N)
2020-02-25HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2020-02-25HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-25HouseRead third time
2020-02-24HouseRead second time
2020-02-20HouseReported from Transportation with amendments (20-Y 1-N)
2020-02-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 1-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB758S1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107876D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107876D-S1
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105149D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462100(n/a)See Bill Text
4621015(n/a)See Bill Text
4622101(n/a)See Bill Text
462904(n/a)See Bill Text
462908.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462908.1:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB758&201+sum+SB758
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB758+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB758S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB758ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB758ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1269+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S11V0057+SB0758
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0758+SB0758
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0520SB0758+SB0758
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0521SB0758+SB0758
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0522SB0758+SB0758
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0523SB0758+SB0758
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1903V0021+SB0758
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H19V0159+SB0758
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1348+SB0758
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1149SB0758+SB0758
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1954SB0758+SB0758
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2259+SB0758

Bill Comments

feedback