VA SB744 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Elections Commission; establishment; purpose. Establishes the Virginia Elections Commission as an advisory commission in the legislative branch for the purpose of studying and making recommendations on matters related to the administration and conduct of elections in the Commonwealth in order to ensure the accessibility, integrity, efficiency, and security of elections in the Commonwealth. The Commission will be composed of 15 members, including members of local electoral boards, general registrars, and members of the General Assembly, and shall employ staff as it deems necessary to assist in carrying out its duties. Virginia Elections Commission; establishment; purpose. Establishes the Virginia Elections Commission as an advisory commission in the legislative branch for the purpose of studying and making recommendations on matters related to the administration and conduct of elections in the Commonwealth in order to ensure the accessibility, integrity, efficiency, and security of elections in the Commonwealth. The Commission will be composed of 15 members, including members of local electoral boards, general registrars, and members of the General Assembly, and shall employ staff as it deems necessary to assist in carrying out its duties.
Title
Virginia Elections Commission; created, adoption of recommendations, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-03-03 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-28 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 22107104D-H1 |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 7-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22105813D-ES1 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB744ES1 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105813D-S1 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105813D-S1 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22104542D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Elections
General Assembly
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Elections
General Assembly
Study Commissions Committees and Reports