VA SB743 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0491)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0491)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Former law-enforcement officers; retention of identification and badge. Provides that a former law-enforcement officer with at least 10 years of service who has been diagnosed with post-traumatic stress disorder or is disabled shall, upon request, be issued a photo identification and badge indicating that he honorably served, both of which will be mounted by the employing department or agency in such a manner that it will be impossible for anyone to carry it on his person. Former law-enforcement officers; retention of identification and badge. Provides that a former law-enforcement officer with at least 10 years of service who has been diagnosed with post-traumatic stress disorder or is disabled shall, upon request, be issued a photo identification and badge indicating that he honorably served, both of which will be mounted by the employing department or agency in such a manner that it will be impossible for anyone to carry it on his person.
Title
Law-enforcement officers, former; retention of identification and badge.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (79-Y 19-N) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0491) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 491 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB743ER) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Passage (79-Y 19-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed House (79-Y 19-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from Public Safety (17-Y 5-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22104759D |