VA SB737 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0370)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0370)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local electoral boards; office vacated if board member ceases to be qualified voter of county or city. Provides that if a member of a local electoral board ceases to be a qualified voter of the county or city for which he was appointed, his office is vacated and such vacancy is to be filled as provided by law. The bill clarifies that a person must be a qualified voter of the county or city in order to be eligible to serve as an electoral board member of that county or city.
Title
Local electoral boards; office vacated if board member ceases to be qualified voter of county, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0370) | |
2020-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 370 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB737ER) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103945D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1285 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0295)