VA SB733 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Committee substitute printed 20108469D-H1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provision of abortion; informed consent; regulations. Eliminates the procedures and processes, including the performance of an ultrasound, the provision of specified information, and the offer to review certain printed materials, required under existing law to effect a pregnant person's informed written consent prior to the performance of an abortion; however, the bill retains the requirement that a physician obtain a pregnant person's informed written consent prior to performing any abortion. The bill expands who can perform first trimester abortions to include any person jointly licensed by the Board of Medicine and Nursing as a nurse practitioner acting within such person's scope of practice. The bill removes a provision classifying facilities that perform five or more first trimester abortions per month as hospitals for the purpose of complying with regulations establishing minimum standards for hospitals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion; informed consent, regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute agreed to (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 19 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108469D-H1
2020-02-24HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-03HouseRead first time
2020-02-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-29SenateChair votes Yes
2020-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (20-Y 20-N)
2020-01-28SenatePrinted as engrossed 20106530D-ES1
2020-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB733ES1
2020-01-28SenateAmendment by Senator McClellan agreed to
2020-01-28SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-01-28SenateSubstitute by Senator Newman withdrawn 20106576D-S2
2020-01-28SenateFloor substitute printed 20106576D-S2 (Newman)
2020-01-28Senate20106530D-S1
2020-01-28SenateCommittee substitute agreed to (20-Y 19-N)
2020-01-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-28SenateRead second time
2020-01-27SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106530D-S1
2020-01-23SenateIncorporates SB68 (Locke)
2020-01-23SenateIncorporates SB21 (Saslaw)
2020-01-23SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102740D

Same As/Similar To

SB21 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Incorporated by Education and Health
SB68 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Incorporated by Education and Health

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16177(n/a)See Bill Text
18272(n/a)See Bill Text
18276(n/a)See Bill Text
321127(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB733
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB733+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB733S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB733S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB733ES1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB733H1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0060+SB0733
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0149SB0733+SB0733
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0209SB0733+SB0733
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0223SB0733+SB0733
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H08V0388+SB0733

Bill Comments

feedback