VA HB980 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0898)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0898)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provision of abortion. Expands who can perform first trimester abortions to include any person jointly licensed by the Board of Medicine and Nursing as a nurse practitioner acting within such person's scope of practice. The bill eliminates all the procedures and processes, including the performance of an ultrasound, required to effect a pregnant person's informed written consent to the performance of an abortion; however, the bill does not change the requirement that a pregnant person's informed written consent first be obtained. The bill removes language classifying facilities that perform five or more first trimester abortions per month as hospitals for the purpose of complying with regulations establishing minimum standards for hospitals.
Title
Abortion; expands who can perform in first trimester, informed consent required.
Sponsors
Del. Charniele Herring [D] | Del. Jennifer Foy [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Kathy Tran [D] | Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 44-N) (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 45-N) (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 45-N) (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0898) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 898 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB980ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108525D-S1 (52-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Chair votes Yes |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 20-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB980S1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108525D-S1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108525D-S1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-28 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 45-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 45-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB980H1 |
2020-01-27 | House | Delegate Gilbert floor amendment ruled not germane |
2020-01-27 | House | Delegate Gilbert floor amendments ruled not germane |
2020-01-27 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106266D-H1 |
2020-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Incorporates HB1060 (Adams, D.M.) |
2020-01-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106266D-H1 |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105164D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1060 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
SB733 (Same As) 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0899)
SB733 (Same As) 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0899)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 77 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 72 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 76 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 127 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |