VA SB729 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Hearing: Feb 17 in House Committee Room
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

School principals; incident reports. Eliminates the requirement that school principals report certain enumerated acts that may constitute a misdemeanor offense to law enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School principals; incident reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenateRead third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
2020-02-10SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Education and Health (10-Y 3-N 1-A)
2020-01-27SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102123D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221279.3:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback