VA HB257 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0335)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

School principals; incident reports. Eliminates the requirement that school principals report to law enforcement certain enumerated acts that may constitute a misdemeanor offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School principals; incident reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (46-Y 44-N) (Y: 46 N: 44 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (81-Y 15-N) (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0335)
2020-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 335 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020
2020-02-27SenateSigned by President
2020-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB257ER)
2020-02-26HouseEnrolled
2020-02-21HouseVOTE: Adoption (46-Y 44-N)
2020-02-21HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 20108367D-S1 (46-Y 44-N)
2020-02-21HousePending question ordered
2020-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-19SenatePassed Senate with substitute (28-Y 11-N)
2020-02-19SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB257S1
2020-02-19SenateSubstitute by Senator McClellan agreed to 20108367D-S1
2020-02-19SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-19SenateRead third time
2020-02-19SenateFloor substitute printed 20108367D-S1 (McClellan)
2020-02-17SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13SenateReported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N)
2020-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-04HouseVOTE: Passage (81-Y 15-N)
2020-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House (81-Y 15-N)
2020-02-03HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB257H1
2020-02-03HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20105280D-H1
2020-02-03HouseRead second time
2020-01-31HouseRead first time
2020-01-29HouseReported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
2020-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 20105280D-H1
2020-01-29HouseIncorporates HB695 (Simonds)
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N)
2020-01-13HouseAssigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
2019-12-30HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-12-30HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102602D

Same As/Similar To

HB695 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Education
SB729 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0173)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221279.3:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB257
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB257+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB257H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB257S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB257ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0335+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0901V0048+HB0257
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H09V0062+HB0257
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0363+HB0257
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0225+HB0257
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0655HB0257+HB0257
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0713HB0257+HB0257
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1146+HB0257

Bill Comments

feedback