VA SB726 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0809)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0809)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
CBD oil and THC-A oil; certification for use; dispensing. Provides that a practitioner may issue a written certification for the use of cannabidiol (CBD) oil or THC-A oil for the treatment or to alleviate the symptoms of any diagnosed condition or disease determined by the practitioner to benefit from such use. Under current law, a practitioner may only issue such certification for the treatment or to alleviate the symptoms of intractable epilepsy. The bill increases the supply of CBD oil or THC-A oil a pharmaceutical processor may dispense from a 30-day supply to a 90-day supply. The bill reduces the minimum amount of cannabidiol or tetrahydrocannabinol acid per milliliter for a dilution of the Cannabis plant to fall under the definition of CBD oil or THC-A oil, respectively. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Joint Commission on Health Care. The bill contains an emergency clause. This bill incorporates SB 597, SB 788, and SB 795 and is identical to HB 1251.
Title
CBD oil and THC-A oil; certification for use, dispensing.
Sponsors
Sen. Siobhan Dunnavant [R] | Sen. Dave Marsden [D] | Sen. Jill Vogel [R] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Sen. Monty Mason [D] | Sen. Jennifer Wexton [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0809) | |
2018-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 809 (effective 4/9/18) | |
2018-03-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB726ER) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-28 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed House with amendment (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2018-02-28 | House | Emergency clause added |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Taken up out of order pursuant to House Rule 52 (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB726S2 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106272D-S2 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 18105744D-S1 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Incorporates SB788 (Marsden) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Incorporates SB597 (Vogel) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Incorporates SB795 (Dunnavant) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106272D-S2 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Incorporates SB795 (Dunnavant) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18105744D-S1 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102119D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 250.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |