VA SB722 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Condominium Act and Property Owners' Association Act; access to association books and records; duty to redact. Provides that books and records kept by or on behalf of a unit owners' association or a property owners' association shall be withheld from inspection and copying in their entirety only to the extent that an exclusion from disclosure enumerated in the Condominium Act or Property Owners' Association Act, as applicable, applies to the entire content of such books and records. The bill provides that, otherwise, only those portions of the books and records containing information subject to an exclusion may be withheld, and all portions of the books and records that are not so excluded shall be disclosed at the requesting member's expense.
Title
Condominium and Property Owners' Association Acts; access to association books and records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 663 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB722ER) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB722S1 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106260D-S1 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106260D-S1 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100400D |