VA SB716 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of State Police; recommend options to expedite the process of performing background checks; report. Requests that the Department of State Police (the Department) identify, analyze, and recommend options to expedite and improve the efficiency of its process for performing requested background checks. The bill requires the Department to report its findings and recommendations to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services by November 1, 2018.
Title
Background checks; Department of State Police shall recommend, etc., options to expedite process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 662 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB716ER) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (36-Y 4-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2018-03-07 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-06 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed bill reprinted 18103563D-E |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18103563D-E |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB716E |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Committee amendment from Finance agreed to |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Committee amendment from Rehabilitation and Social Services agreed to |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Rereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103563D |