VA SB710 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Distributed renewable energy. Promotes the establishment of distributed renewable solar and other renewable energy. The measure (i) increases from one percent to 10 percent the systemwide cap on the total amount of renewable energy that can be net metered in a utility's service territory, (ii) authorizes third-party power purchase agreements for all customer classes throughout the Commonwealth, (iii) allows local governments and certain other public bodies to install solar or wind facilities of up to five megawatts on government-owned property and use the electricity for government-owned buildings, (iv) allows all net metering customers to attribute output from a single solar array to multiple meters, (v) allows the owner of a multifamily residential building or the common areas of a condominium to install a renewable energy generation facility and sell the electricity to tenants or condominium unit owners, (vi) removes the restriction on customers installing a net-metered generation facility larger than that required to meet their previous 12 months' demand, (vii) raises the cap for net-metered nonresidential generation facilities from one megawatt to three megawatts, and (viii) removes the ability of utilities to assess standby charges. The measure also amends the Commonwealth Energy Policy to include provisions supporting distributed generation of renewable energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distributed renewable energy; sale of electricity under third-party sales agreements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator McClellan reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB710S2
2020-02-11SenateSubstitute by Senator McClellan agreed to 20108117D-S2
2020-02-11SenateFloor substitute printed 20108117D-S2 (McClellan)
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateSubstitute by Senator McCLellan rejected 20107969D-S1
2020-02-11SenateSubstitute by Senator McClellan reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-07SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB710S1
2020-02-07SenateSubstitute by Senator McClellan agreed to 20107969D-S1
2020-02-07SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-07SenateRead second time
2020-02-07SenateFloor substitute printed 20107969D-S1 (McClellan)
2020-02-06SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N)
2020-01-23SenateAssigned C&L sub: Energy
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104871D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522109.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback