CA SB295 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - June 26 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - June 26 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21113 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: regulations on public property.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB295 Dodd (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Assembly | June 26 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1071.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 579.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 21113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |