VA HB1184 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Distributed renewable energy. Promotes the establishment of distributed renewable solar and other renewable energy. The measure (i) requires the State Corporation Commission to establish by regulation a shared solar program that allows multifamily customers of investor-owned utilities, other than American Electric Power, to purchase electric power through a subscription in a shared solar facility; (ii) raises the cap on the total amount of renewable energy that can be net metered in a utility's service territory from one percent to six percent, five percent of which is available to all customers and one percent of which is available only to low-income utility customers; (iii) raises the cap for net-metered nonresidential generation facilities from one megawatt to three megawatts; (iv) allows certain localities to install solar or wind facilities of up to five megawatts on government-owned property and use the electricity for government-owned buildings, (v) increases the cap on the capacity of generation from facilities from the customer's expected annual energy consumption to 150 percent of such amount for customers in Dominion Energy Virginia's service territory; (vi) prohibits standby charges for any residential customer-generator or agricultural customer-generator of an investor-owned utility other than Dominion Energy Virginia; and (vii) increases the cap on third party power purchase agreements to 500 megawatts for jurisdictional customers and 500 megawatts for nonjurisdictional customers of Dominion Energy Virginia and to 40 megawatts for customers of American Electric Power. The measure also amends the Commonwealth Energy Policy to include provisions supporting distributed generation of renewable energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distributed solar & other renewable energy; sales of electricity under third-party agreements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 41-N) (Y: 53 N: 40 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1184ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-08SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (25-Y 14-N)
2020-03-08HouseVOTE: Adoption (53-Y 41-N)
2020-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (53-Y 41-N)
2020-03-07HouseConference substitute printed 20109937D-H1
2020-03-07 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-05SenateSenators: McClellan, Spruill, Vogel
2020-03-05SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-05HouseDelegates: Lopez, Keam, Runion
2020-03-05HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-04HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-03-03SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-03-03SenateSenate insisted on substitute (23-Y 17-N)
2020-03-02HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N)
2020-03-02HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 20109062D-S1 (0-Y 98-N)
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-27SenatePassed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N)
2020-02-27SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1184S1
2020-02-27SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20109062D-S1
2020-02-27SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24SenateCommittee substitute printed 20109062D-S1
2020-02-24SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 2-N)
2020-02-18SenateRereferred to Commerce and Labor
2020-02-18SenateRereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (56-Y 44-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-06HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-04HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N)
2020-01-28HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3
2020-01-22HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-22HouseReferred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104922D

Same As/Similar To

HB572 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
SB710 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
HB572 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
SB710 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522109.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1184&201+sum+HB1184
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1184+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1184S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1184H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1184ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1403V0044+HB1184
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0207+HB1184
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0830+HB1184
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S01V0112+HB1184
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0211+HB1184
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1050HB1184+HB1184
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1193HB1184+HB1184
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1672+HB1184
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1409HB1184+HB1184
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2119+HB1184
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1868HB1184+HB1184

Bill Comments

feedback