VA SB705 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0567)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0567)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Towing; civil penalty. Requires a towing and recovery operator to include the contact information of the Division of Consumer Counsel within the Office of the Attorney General on any invoice charging $10,000 or more for towing and recovery services rendered pursuant to a lawful request for towing by a law-enforcement officer for the towing and recovery of a vehicle with a gross vehicle weight rating of greater than 26,000 pounds. The bill subjects towing and recovery operators in violation of the bill's provisions to a civil penalty of $1,000 per violation. Towing; civil penalty. Requires a towing and recovery operator to include the contact information of the Division of Consumer Counsel within the Office of the Attorney General on any invoice charging $10,000 or more for towing and recovery services rendered pursuant to a lawful request for towing by a law-enforcement officer for the towing and recovery of a vehicle with a gross vehicle weight rating of greater than 26,000 pounds. The bill subjects towing and recovery operators in violation of the bill's provisions to a civil penalty of $1,000 per violation.
Title
Towing; certain large vehicles, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Marsden [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (69-Y 31-N) (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0567) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 567 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB705ER) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (69-Y 31-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed House (69-Y 31-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 Highway Safety and Policy |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB705S1 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105882D-S1 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105882D-S1 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22103299D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 517 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 118 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 118.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 119 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1209.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 644.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |