VA SB703 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Charges for information supplied by the Department of Motor Vehicles. Allows private toll facility operators to request DMV records and exempts private toll facility operators or their employees or agents from being assessed a charge by the Department of Motor Vehicles for supplying information for official use.
Title
DMV; charges for information supplied to toll facility operators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2017 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-02 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Continued to 2017 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Assigned Trans sub: Tolling |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16103251D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 214.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |