VA SB699 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revenue reserves and budgetary amendments. Provides that if the Governor in the Budget Bill recommends a transfer of funds in the Revenue Reserve Fund in excess of the statutory 15 percent combined balance limit, then the corresponding purpose and proposed use of such transferred funds shall be included within the corresponding budget items. The bill also directs that if the Revenue Stabilization Fund and Revenue Reserve Fund are in excess of the statutory 15 percent combined balance limit, the State Comptroller shall transfer such excess amounts to the general fund and present such amounts as an assigned fund balance for nonrecurring expenditures on the Comptroller's preliminary annual report and if such a transfer is required, but the Revenue Stabilization Fund is not in excess of its Constitutional 15 percent balance limit, the amounts required to be transferred shall first be deposited into the Revenue Stabilization Fund instead of the general fund. Revenue reserves and budgetary amendments. Provides that if the Governor in the Budget Bill recommends a transfer of funds in the Revenue Reserve Fund in excess of the statutory 15 percent combined balance limit, then the corresponding purpose and proposed use of such transferred funds shall be included within the corresponding budget items. The bill also directs that if the Revenue Stabilization Fund and Revenue Reserve Fund are in excess of the statutory 15 percent combined balance limit, the State Comptroller shall transfer such excess amounts to the general fund and present such amounts as an assigned fund balance for nonrecurring expenditures on the Comptroller's preliminary annual report and if such a transfer is required, but the Revenue Stabilization Fund is not in excess of its Constitutional 15 percent balance limit, the amounts required to be transferred shall first be deposited into the Revenue Stabilization Fund instead of the general fund.
Title
Revenue reserves & budgetary amendments; commitment of funds for Revenue Reserve Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-09 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2024-03-09 | Senate | No further action taken |
2024-03-05 | House | Delegates: Torian, Carr, Austin |
2024-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senators: Lucas, Locke, McDougle |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-29 | House | House requested conference committee |
2024-02-29 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2024-02-28 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB699H1 |
2024-02-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24108084D-H1 |
2024-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 24108084D-H1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB699S1 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24107600D-S1 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107600D-S1 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 24102559D |