VA SB699 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Waynesboro; elections and appointments; council, city manager, and school board. Changes the composition of the council of the City of Waynesboro to have one member from each of the four wards, who must reside in that ward and be elected by the voters of that ward, and one member at large, who can reside in any ward and is elected by the voters at large. The bill changes the position of chairman to that of mayor and creates a vice mayor position. The bill extends from one year to two years the term of other city officers, including city manager and city clerk. The bill changes dates to reflect the change of elections from May to November and the start of terms from July to January.
Title
Waynesboro, City of; amending charter, elections and appointments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 571 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB699ER) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Assigned Local Gov sub: Charters |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22103366D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1311 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0332)
HB1311 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0332)
HB1311 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0332)