VA SB695 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0654)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0654)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; wine and beer licenses for certain properties. Provides that the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board may grant retail on-premises wine and beer licenses to persons operating a concert and dinner-theater venue on property fronting Natural Bridge School Road in Natural Bridge Station, Virginia, and formerly operated as Natural Bridge High School, which licenses shall authorize the licensee to sell wine and beer during events for on-premises consumption. The bill requires that food, whether or not prepared on the premises, be served whenever wine or beer is served.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; wine and beer licenses for certain properties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N) (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N) (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0654) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 654 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB695ER) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-08 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2016-03-04 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N) |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed House with amendment (92-Y 6-N) |
2016-03-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2016-03-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-01 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (20-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16103421D |