VA SB693 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0642)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0642)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Waterway Maintenance Fund; Grant Program. Establishes the Virginia Waterway Maintenance Grant Program and Fund, administered by the Virginia Port Authority (the Authority), to provide grants to political subdivisions and local governing bodies that propose certain dredging projects and related activities. The bill directs the Authority to manage the grant program by developing guidelines and procedures for the application process and for the awarding of annual grants.
Title
Virginia Waterway Maintenance Fund and Grant Program; established, awarding a grant of funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0642) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 642 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB693ER) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed House (95-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-06 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB693S1 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18105456D-S1 |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18105456D-S1 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102798D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 132.3:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 132.3:4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |