VA SB687 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0642)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0642)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Abuse and neglect; financial exploitation; incapacitated adults; penalties. Changes the term "incapacitated adult" to "vulnerable adult" for the purposes of the crime of abuse and neglect of such adults and defines "vulnerable adult" as any person 18 years of age or older who is impaired by reason of mental illness, intellectual or developmental disability, physical illness or disability, or other causes, including age, to the extent the adult lacks sufficient understanding or capacity to make, communicate, or carry out reasonable decisions concerning his well-being or has one or more limitations that substantially impair the adult's ability to independently provide for his daily needs or safeguard his person, property, or legal interests. The bill also changes the term "person with mental incapacity" to the same meaning of "vulnerable adult" for the purposes of the crime of financial exploitation. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia Criminal Justice Conference.
Title
Abuse & neglect; financial exploitation, changes term incapacitated adults, definitions, penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0642) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 642 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB687ER) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-11 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Leftwich, Campbell, R.R., Mullin |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Mason, Petersen, Peake |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | House requested conference committee |
2022-03-10 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2022-03-10 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Title replaced 22107413D-H1 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB687H1 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22107413D-H1 |
2022-03-09 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 22107413D-H1 |
2022-03-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB687S1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105874D-S1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105874D-S1 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22104033D |
Same As/Similar To
SB126 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Incorporated by Judiciary
SB126 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Incorporated by Judiciary
HB496 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0259)
HB496 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0259)
SB126 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Incorporated by Judiciary
HB496 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0259)
HB496 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0259)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 178.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 369 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 60.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.20:7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |