VA HB496 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0259)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0259)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Abuse and neglect; financial exploitation; incapacitated adults; penalties. Changes the term "incapacitated adult" to "vulnerable adult" for the purposes of the crime of abuse and neglect of such adults and defines "vulnerable adult" as any person 18 years of age or older who is impaired by reason of mental illness, intellectual or developmental disability, physical illness or disability, or other causes, including age, to the extent the adult lacks sufficient understanding or capacity to make, communicate, or carry out reasonable decisions concerning his well-being or has one or more limitations that substantially impair the adult's ability to independently provide for his daily needs or safeguard his person, property, or legal interests. The bill also changes the term "person with mental incapacity" to the same meaning of "vulnerable adult" for the purposes of the crime of financial exploitation. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia Criminal Justice Conference.
Title
Abuse & neglect; financial exploitation, changes term incapacitated adults, definitions, penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption #2 (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0259) | |
2022-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 259 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB496ER) |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption #2 (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 22106769D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Reconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 1-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 22106769D-S1 (96-Y 1-N) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB496S1 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106769D-S1 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106769D-S1 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100823D |
Same As/Similar To
SB687 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0642)
SB687 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0642)
SB687 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0642)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 178.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 369 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 60.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.20:7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |