VA SB126 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Incorporated by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Incorporated by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Abuse and neglect; financial exploitation; incapacitated adults; penalties. Changes the term "incapacitated adult" to "vulnerable adult" for the purposes of the crime of abuse and neglect of such adults and defines "vulnerable adult" as any person 18 years of age or older who is impaired by reason of mental illness, intellectual or developmental disability, physical illness or disability, advanced age, or other causes to the extent the adult lacks sufficient understanding or capacity to make, communicate, or carry out reasonable decisions concerning his well-being or has one or more limitations that substantially impair the adult's ability to independently provide for his daily needs or safeguard his person, property, or legal interests. The bill adds the definition of "advanced age" as it is used in the definition of "vulnerable adult" to mean 65 years of age or older. The bill also changes the term "person with mental incapacity" to the same meaning of "vulnerable adult" for the purposes of the crime of financial exploitation.
Title
Abuse and neglect; financial exploitation, changes term incapacitated adults, penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Judiciary (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Incorporated by Judiciary |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100374D |
Same As/Similar To
SB687 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0642)
SB687 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0642)
SB687 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0642)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 178.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 369 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 60.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.20:7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |