VA SB654 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Passed by indefinitely in Health, Welfare and Institutions (11-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Passed by indefinitely in Health, Welfare and Institutions (11-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Health Club Act; automated external defibrillator required in health clubs. Requires each health club location to have a working automated external defibrillator.
Title
Virginia Health Club Act; automated external defibrillator required in health clubs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House: Passed by indefinitely in Health, Welfare and Institutions (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Passed by indefinitely in Health, Welfare and Institutions (11-Y 9-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18103643D-E |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB654E |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (11-Y 4-N) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103643D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 296 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 296.2:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |