VA SB65 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-21 - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (5-Y 17-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-21 - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (5-Y 17-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Nursing homes; notice of liability insurance coverage. Requires nursing homes, certified nursing facilities, and assisted living facilities to inform patients and residents about liability insurance available to pay claims of the patient or resident.
Title
Nursing homes; notice of liability insurance coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (5-Y 17-N) (Y: 6 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (6-Y 16-N) (Y: 7 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (6-Y 16-N) (Y: 7 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-21 | House: Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (5-Y 17-N) | |
2012-02-15 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2012-02-15 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-15 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB65S1 | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104654D-S1 | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104654D-S1 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Licensing | |
2012-01-05 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-05 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101310D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 127 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 138 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1808 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |