VA SB645 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Local arbitration agreements; disclosure of certain information. Requires a locality, for any procurement contract for goods and services except for construction, construction-related services, transportation construction, or transportation-related construction--and any purchasing decision to ensure that solicitations require the bidder or offeror to disclose certain information regarding pre-dispute arbitration clauses and consider each bidder or offeror's policies and practices related to arbitration. The bill requires each locality to seek to contract with qualified entities and business owners that can demonstrate or will certify that they do not use pre-dispute arbitration clauses in contracts with employees or consumers, and to evaluate bidders and offerors based on disclosures required under the bill, in the event no bidder or offeror can demonstrate or will certify that they do not use pre-dispute arbitration clauses in contracts with employees or consumers. The bill authorizes a locality to cancel, terminate, or suspend, in whole or in part, the contract of any contractor who violates a provision of the bill and declare the contractor ineligible for further contracts with such locality.
Title
Local arbitration agreements; disclosure of certain information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2020-02-28 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-27 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to |
2020-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendments (15-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB645S1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106982D-S1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106982D-S1 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104696D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 4377.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4377.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |