VA SB633 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil actions; health care bills and records. Defines the term "bill" for the purposes of evidence of medical services provided in certain civil actions as any statement of charges, an invoice, or any other form prepared by a health care provider or its agent, or third-party agent, identifying the costs of health care services provided. The bill also clarifies the procedures for introducing evidence of medical reports, statements, or records of a health care provider by affidavit in general district court.
Title
Civil actions; health care bills and records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 470 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB633ER) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-02-24 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-21 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22103315D-E |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB633E |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22103315D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1145 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)
HB1145 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)
HB1145 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 88.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 413.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |