VA HB1145 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil actions; health care bills and records. Defines the term "bill" for the purposes of evidence of medical services provided in certain civil actions as any statement of charges, an invoice, or any other form prepared by a health care provider or its agent, or third-party agent, identifying the costs of health care services provided. The bill also clarifies the procedures for introducing evidence of medical reports, statements, or records of a health care provider by affidavit in general district court.
Title
Civil actions; health care bills and records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 469 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1145ER) |
2022-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 22103334D-E |
2022-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1145E |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22103334D |
Same As/Similar To
SB633 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470)
SB633 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470)
SB633 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 88.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 413.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |