VA SB624 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0468)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Emergency care; school board employees. Provides that employees of a school board or a local health department approved by the local governing body to provide health services that render certain acts of emergency care, including emergency first aid, cardiopulmonary resuscitation (CPR), or use of an automated external defibrillator (AED), shall not be liable for ordinary negligence in acts or omissions on the part of such employee while engaged in such acts of emergency care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency care; school board employees that render certain care shall not be liable for negligence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 1-N) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0468)
2014-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 468 (effective 7/1/14)
2014-03-09SenateSigned by President
2014-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2014-03-06SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB624ER)
2014-03-06SenateEnrolled
2014-03-03HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 1-N)
2014-03-03HousePassed House (91-Y 1-N)
2014-03-03HouseRead third time
2014-02-28HouseRead second time
2014-02-26HouseReported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
2014-02-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2014-02-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil Law
2014-02-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2014-02-07HouseRead first time
2014-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2014-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
2014-02-03SenatePrinted as engrossed 14103162D-E
2014-02-03SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB624E
2014-02-03SenateEmergency clause deleted
2014-02-03SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2014-02-03SenateReading of amendments waived
2014-02-03SenateRead second time
2014-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2014-01-29SenateReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 2-N)
2014-01-16SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2014-01-16SenatePresented and ordered printed with emergency clause 14103162D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801225(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+SB624
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+SB624+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+SB624E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+SB624ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+CHAP0468+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+S03V0135+SB0624
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+SV0231SB0624+SB0624
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+SV0267SB0624+SB0624
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+H0802V0144+SB0624
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+H08V0376+SB0624
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+vot+HV1242+SB0624

Bill Comments 750

feedback