VA SB612 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commission for Historical Statues in the United States Capitol; replacement of Robert E. Lee statue in National Statuary Hall Collection. Creates the Commission for Historical Statues in the United States Capitol to determine whether the Robert E. Lee statue in the National Statuary Hall Collection at the United States Capitol should be replaced and, if so, to recommend to the General Assembly as a replacement a statue of a prominent Virginia citizen of historic renown or renowned for distinguished civil or military service to be commemorated in the National Statuary Hall Collection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Historical Statues in the United States Capitol, Commission for; removal of Robert E. Lee statue.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 44-N) (Y: 52 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 5-N) (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 19 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18SenateEnrolled
2020-03-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB612ER)
2020-03-08SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N)
2020-03-08HouseVOTE: Adoption (52-Y 44-N)
2020-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (52-Y 44-N)
2020-03-07 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-03HouseDelegates: Ward, Bagby, Fariss
2020-03-03HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-02SenateSenators: Lucas, Favola, Petersen
2020-03-02SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-02SenateSenate acceded to request (29-Y 11-N)
2020-02-27HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-02-27HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2020-02-26SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N)
2020-02-24HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
2020-02-24HousePassed House with substitute (55-Y 44-N)
2020-02-24HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB612H1
2020-02-24HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108588D-H1
2020-02-24HouseRead third time
2020-02-21HouseRead second time
2020-02-19HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108588D-H1
2020-02-19HouseReported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 5-N)
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-10SenatePassed Senate (20-Y 19-N)
2020-02-10SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N)
2020-02-07SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB612S1
2020-02-07SenateSubstitute by Senator Lucas agreed to 20107688D-S1
2020-02-07SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-07SenateRead second time
2020-02-06SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-05SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-05SenateCommittee amendments rejected
2020-02-05SenateRead second time
2020-02-05SenateFloor substitute printed 20107688D-S1 (Lucas)
2020-02-04SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31SenateReported from Rules with amendments (10-Y 5-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103897D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB612&201+sum+SB612
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB612+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB612S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB612H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB612ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S10V0050+SB0612
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0288SB0612+SB0612
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0425SB0612+SB0612
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0426SB0612+SB0612
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0427SB0612+SB0612
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H20V0162+SB0612
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1269+SB0612
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1007SB0612+SB0612
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1366SB0612+SB0612
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2103+SB0612
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1885SB0612+SB0612

Bill Comments

feedback